+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 28, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0316)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 316 (effective 7/1/05)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2491ER)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 051137456-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2491E
- Amendment by Del. Petersen agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: Subcommittee #3...
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051137456
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2005: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
January 25, 2005: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor