+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 281 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2486ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N)
- Read third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 11104109D
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N)
February 3, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor