+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 387 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2484ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 7-N)
- Passed Senate (30-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 5-N)
- Passed Senate (32-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 990247464-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (24-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 4
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 990247464
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 5-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 7-N)
February 22, 1999: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (24-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor