+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 1, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
On March 26, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 458 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2482ER)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 999755807-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 999755807
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1999: Reported from Education with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor