+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 9, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0877)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2482ER)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 877 (effective 1/1/98)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2482ER)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 972182168
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1997: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor