+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 2, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0923)
On April 30, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 923 (effective 7/1/97)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: ADOPTION (29-Y 66-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (29-Y 66-N)
- Pending question ordered
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2481ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 978280476-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 978280476
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (29-Y 66-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1997: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (13-Y 2-N)
January 29, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1997: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor