+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 109 (effective 7/1/05)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2478ER)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: Subcommittee #2...
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056006498
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2005: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor