+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0417)
On March 21, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 417 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2470ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (19-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 057162400
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2005: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2005: Reported from Science and Technology (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor