+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (97-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (10-Y 9-N)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 079347472
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2007: Reported from Transportation with amendments (10-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor