+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by temporarily
- Read second time
- Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 092397854-H2
- Committee substitute from Rules rejected 094211664-H1
- Amendment by Delegate Armstrong rejected (45-Y 52-N)
- VOTE: --- REJECTED (45-Y 52-N)
- Amendments by Delegate Griffith agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2463EH2
- Printed as engrossed 092397854-EH2
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 092397854-H2
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight & Government Activities (Landes)
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 094211664-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 092356804
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 2009: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 9, 2009: VOTE: --- REJECTED (45-Y 52-N)
February 6, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
February 6, 2009: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
February 3, 2009: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor