+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2462ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 17104544D
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor