+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (60-Y 36-N)
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to (60-Y 36-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 11100205D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2011: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (60-Y 36-N)
February 3, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor