+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 47 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB246ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 084010664-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB246E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On December 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084010664