+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 123 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB246ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 1-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (62-Y 38-N)
- Read third time and passed House (62-Y 38-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PS sub: Public Safety
On December 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100997D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2020: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
February 18, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2020: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 38-N)
January 24, 2020: Reported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N)
January 23, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark H. Levine
Type:
Primary Sponsor