+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 526 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB246ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 1-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Passed House (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988567199
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 1-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor