+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 541 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2449ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (91-2-N 1-A)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators: Cosgrove, Stanley, Spruill
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Delegates: Knight, Stolle, Lindsey
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 96-N 1-A)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 1-A)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 17103897D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2449E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 17103897D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
February 24, 2017: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 22, 2017: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 1-A)
February 17, 2017: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Reported from Local Government with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 3, 2017: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor