+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
On March 26, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 825 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2448ER)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: Subcommittee #1...
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056099520
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2005: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor