+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 9, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0873)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 873 (effective 7/1/97)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2448ER)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2448ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 970379168-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 970379168
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1997: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1997: Reported from Agriculture w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor