+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0165)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 165 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2445ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 23106737D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2445S1
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 23106737D-S1 (0-Y 94-N)
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Locke, Dunnavant, Rouse
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Bennett-Parker, McNamara, Durant
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 23106737D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2445H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 23105671D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 23105671D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 23104550D