+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2437ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Senator Reynolds agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment #2 rejected
- Committee amendment #1 agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11104290D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2437E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 11104290D