+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 240 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2432ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 17104036D
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2017: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor