+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 5, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
On March 27, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 608 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2430ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 4-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N 1-A)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 1-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to A. C. & N. R. sub-committee: Solid Waste
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 999288106-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 999288106-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (21-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Committee substitute printed 999288106-H1
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 999265376
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 22, 1999: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 1-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1999: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor