+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 68 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2429ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (19-Y 3-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #2
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 11101834D
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2011: Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 14, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2011: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 3-N)
January 26, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor