+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Failed to report(Defeated) in General Laws (7-Y 8-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 42-N)
- Read third time and passed House (58-Y 42-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (52-Y 40-N)
- Read second time and engrossed (52-Y 40-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 6-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 973487260
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 1997: Failed to report(Defeated) in General Laws (7-Y 8-N)
January 30, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 42-N)
January 29, 1997: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (52-Y 40-N)
January 27, 1997: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor