+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (63)
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0988)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2426ER2)
- Enacted, Chapter 988 (effective 7/1/03)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (37-Y 2-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 2-N)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 18-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (82-Y 18-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2426ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 8-N)
- Senate sub. w/amds. agreed to by House (91-Y 8-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds. (36-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - sub w/amds. 032147444-ES1
- Amendments by Sen. Hanger withdrawn
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 032147444-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #1 by Sen. Bolling agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #2 by Sen. Bolling agreed to (21-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 2 (21-Y 19-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 032147444-S1
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (14-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (68-Y 29-N 1-A)
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 030940904-H1
- Amendment by Del. Nixon agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 030940904-EH1
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected
- Pending question ordered
- Motion to refer to Appropriations committtee rejected
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amd 030940904-EH1
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 030940904-H1
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (14-Y 8-N)
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 030759868