+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 728 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2424ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (31-Y 8-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 8-N 1-A)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (31-Y 8-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 8-N 1-A)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 015820612
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 8-N 1-A)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (31-Y 8-N 1-A)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2001: Reported from C. & L. with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
January 19, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2001: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor