+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 22, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
On March 18, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 400 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2422ER)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD8849812-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (20-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD8849812