+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 8, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
On March 6, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 87 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2422ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Title replaced
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (87-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 12-N)
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 5-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (13-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 019077220
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 12-N)
February 12, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2001: Reported from Transportation w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N)
January 18, 2001: Reported from Tra. (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor