+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 19, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402)
On March 15, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 402 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2421ER)
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 973710200-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 973710200
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor