+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 98 (effective 7/1/95)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 13, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2416ER)
On February 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD7747812
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1995: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor