+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 356 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2415ER)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 17104213D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2415E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 17104213D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor