+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: VETO SUSTAINED (49-Y 48-N)
- Governor's veto sustained (49-Y 48-N)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB241ER)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 6-N)
- Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 4-N 2-A)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Appropriations (11-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 18, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: VETO SUSTAINED (49-Y 48-N)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 6-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 4-N 2-A)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor