+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 699 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2408ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2408H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105090D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11105090D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 11103148D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
February 3, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor