+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0922)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 922 (effective 7/1/05)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2408ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2408ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed bill reprinted 058940460-E
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 058940460-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2408E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 058940460