+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 665 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2401ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: #1
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 11103990D
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor