+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 646 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB240ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985447252-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985447252-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985447252-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989683252-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989683252-H1
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989683252-H1
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 984435252
- Referred to Committee on Finance