+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 3-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
On November 28, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100984D
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 3-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 3-N)
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor