+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossment refused by House
- Read second time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 070255220-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 070255220-H1
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Utilities/Employment (Byron)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 075209220