+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 313 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2397ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 15103898D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor