+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
- Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO #2 (68-Y 31-N)
- Governor's veto overridden (68-Y 31-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to by House
- VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (67-Y 31-N)
- Governor's veto overridden (67-Y 31-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2395ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (67-Y 32-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15102289D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2395E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (15-Y 6-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 15102289D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 15, 2015: Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (67-Y 31-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO #2 (68-Y 31-N)
February 24, 2015: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
February 24, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N)
February 5, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from General Laws with amendment (15-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor