+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2390ER)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 038844772
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor