+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 113 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB239ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed 18106254D-H2 (Kilgore)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected 18105399D-H1
- Substitute by Delegate Kilgore agreed to 18106254D-H2
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB239H2
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105399D-H1
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #2
On January 2, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103859D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
January 17, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor