+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102969D