+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 23, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 471 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2386ER)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (6-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed LD8442260
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (6-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor