+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
- Enacted, Chapter 820 (effective 7/1/11)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2385ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 6-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 6-N)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2385ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105327D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2385S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105327D-S1 (78-Y 12-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 12-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 11105327D-S1
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2385H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104851D-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104851D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #3
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 11104096D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
April 6, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 6-N)
February 16, 2011: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 12-N)
February 16, 2011: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
January 28, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor