+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- DEFEATED (47-Y 52-N)
- Read third time and defeated by House (47-Y 52-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 092314820-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2382E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton)
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 092314820
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: --- DEFEATED (47-Y 52-N)
February 6, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
February 6, 2009: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N)
February 3, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor