+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
On April 6, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB238ER)
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD3533308 (HB238E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 1-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N)
February 2, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
January 28, 1994: Reported from C. J. with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor