+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 562 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB238ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987362200-E
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (25-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 2
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987362200
- Referred to Committee on Claims
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (25-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from Claims with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor