+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 324 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2379ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 17103341D
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 2017: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2017: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor