+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 6 (effective 7/1/05)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2379ER)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (12-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2379H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 055068480-H1
- Read second time
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 055068480-H1
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056267480
+ − Votes (4)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2005: Reported from M., P. & P. S. with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor